U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00829
  • Case Name: Novek v. JJT Transportation and Logistics LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 04, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • September 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.