U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00834
  • Case Name: Coleman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.