U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00832
  • Case Name: Mason v. The Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.