U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00842
  • Case Name: Hoster Brothers Inc v. Oklahoma City Landfill LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 21, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • December 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Remand]
  • October 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.