U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00843
  • Case Name: Collins v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.