U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00840
  • Case Name: Craft v. State Farm Insurance Agency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • December 16, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.