U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00847
  • Case Name: Gilbert v. Dollar General Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • May 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Objections]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Approving Final Pretrial Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 01, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Approving Final Pretrial Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.