U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00846
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Express Employment Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.