U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00848
  • Case Name: Lebowitz v. Harmony Nutraceuticals LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 11, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 14, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.