U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00845
  • Case Name: McDade v. Pettigrew
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.