U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00849
  • Case Name: Kristich v. Dickerson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
  • December 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 19, 2022: [Writ of Mandamus]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 26, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.