U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00851
  • Case Name: Bales et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 26, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 26, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.