U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00850
  • Case Name: Flowers v. Bridges
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
  • December 22, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter-Successive 2254/2255]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 27, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.