U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00854
  • Case Name: Sharp et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.