U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00853
  • Case Name: McLane Company Inc v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Stay Case]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.