U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00860
  • Case Name: Johnson v. National Basketball Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.