U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00861
  • Case Name: Brakhage et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.