U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00864
  • Case Name: Stuck v. United States Department of the Army et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.