U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00865
  • Case Name: Malik v. Gerlach
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 30, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.