U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00866
  • Case Name: Patillar v. Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 12, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 03, 2022: [Previous Cases]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.