U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00870
  • Case Name: Timms v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 03, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.