U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00871
  • Case Name: Davis et al v. Gresham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.