U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00872
  • Case Name: Bointy et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • November 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Remand]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 13, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.