U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00875
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.