U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00876
  • Case Name: Nero v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
  • January 24, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 19, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.