U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00878
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Golden Rule Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.