U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00879
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Receipt]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 07, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.