U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00885
  • Case Name: Marino v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 19, 2022: [Surreply]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.