U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00883
  • Case Name: Stacy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Surreply]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.