U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00887
  • Case Name: Bourque v. Director, TDCJ-CID
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Receipt]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 12, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.