U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00895
  • Case Name: Millender v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 05, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.