U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00896
  • Case Name: Seven Energy Investments LLC et al v. MXP Operating LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Default Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.