U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00893
  • Case Name: Shelton v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 13, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.