U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00892
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Stitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 09, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.