U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00899
  • Case Name: Preciado-Munoz v. American Fidelity Assurance Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.