U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00898
  • Case Name: Harris v. Highgate Hotels LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.