U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00894
  • Case Name: Horton v. Garland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.