U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00901
  • Case Name: Nextep Inc v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.