U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00904
  • Case Name: Cox v. Clayton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.