U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00903
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Penn Construction Group Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.