U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00908
  • Case Name: Jalloh v. Garland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order for Response]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 17, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [ICMS - converted docket entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.