U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00909
  • Case Name: The Way International v. The Way Church Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2022: [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
  • October 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.