U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00910
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. MidFirst Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 16, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 11, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • November 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.