U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00915
  • Case Name: Sarnowski v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 18, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.