U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00918
  • Case Name: Lewis et al v. Tyson Foods Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.