U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00916
  • Case Name: Peoples v. Laloge et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Certificate]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.