U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00917
  • Case Name: Brown v. Dynamic Gaming Solutions LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.