U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00920
  • Case Name: Ross v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • October 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.