U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00926
  • Case Name: Scantlin et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.