U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00928
  • Case Name: Baltasar v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.